Buck's, Inc. v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Buck's, Inc.
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Counter Claimant: QuikTrip Corporation
Counter Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Case Number: 8:2015cv00340
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that Buck's, Inc.'s motion for a new trial pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 (filing 110 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JUDGMENT regarding Orders 107 and 108 . Pursuant to the jury's verdict of February 10, 2017 (filing 101 ), and the accompanying orders, judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defendant and counterclaimant. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER setting post-trial briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 5-7 days. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion in Limine; denying 57 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion in Limine. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Summary Judgment 47 filed by QuikTrip Corporation. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that James Murray shall produce the information requestedby the subpoena duces tecum served on him on September 19, 2016. The materials requested by the subpoena duces tecum shall be produced by Murray no later than Friday, October 7, 2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 15 Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck's, Inc. v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buck's, Inc.
Represented By: Kristopher J. Covi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Represented By: Amy L. Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Represented By: Amy L. Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Represented By: Amy L. Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?