Bendfeldt et al v. Window World, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mike Bendfeldt and Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt
Defendant: Window World, Inc. and Associated Materials, LLC
Case Number: 8:2015cv00377
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: FA Gossett
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Case transferred to Western District of North Carolina. Original electronic file sent. (TCL)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #49 Motion to Reconsider defendant Window World's Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
January 18, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Reasserted Rule 12(b)(6) by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Defendant's motion to transfer, Filing No. #37 , pursuant to forum selection clauses and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the doctrine of forum non conveniens, is granted. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to transfer this case to the United States Federal Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
November 17, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of regarding MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer #37 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #35 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tricker, Edward)
June 6, 2016 Filing 46 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer #37 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
June 6, 2016 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #35 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #42 Defendant Window World Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and granting #43 Defendant Associated Materials, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Both Defendants shall have an extension of time until June 6, 2016, to file a reply to their respective Motions to Dismiss or Transfer #35 #37 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SMN)
May 16, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply Brief in Support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #35 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
May 16, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
May 11, 2016 Filing 41 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer #37 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #35 by Attorney Jonathan E. Fortman on behalf of Plaintiffs Mike Bendfeldt, Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt.(Fortman, Jonathan)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #39 the plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Briefing Deadline. Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time until May 11, 2016, to file their response to the defendants' motions to dismiss #35 and #37 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SMN)
April 18, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadline by Attorney Larry E. Welch, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Mike Bendfeldt, Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt.(Welch, Larry)
April 6, 2016 Filing 38 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer #37 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
April 6, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
April 6, 2016 Filing 36 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #35 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
April 6, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on defendant Associated Materials, LLC's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 21, and defendant Window World, Inc.'s motion to dismiss, Filing No. 26. Subsequent to the filings of these motions, plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint, Filing No. 29. As a result, all motions are moot at this time. Defendants are free to file appropriate motions or answers as they deem fit with regard to the Amended Complaint. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 21, is denied as moot; Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 26, is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion to Extend. Defendant Window World shall file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's amended complaint, on or before 4/6/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Associated Materials, LLC shall file its answer or response on or before 4/6/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, ) Modified on 3/2/2016 to add TEXT to the entry as a PDF document is not attached (ADB).
March 1, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
February 19, 2016 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Jonathan E. Fortman on behalf of Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt, Mike Bendfeldt(Fortman, Jonathan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 28 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #26 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vickers Declaration, #2 Exhibit B Kilby Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Curan Declaration)(Futhey, Robert)
January 29, 2016 Filing 27 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #26 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
January 29, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
January 29, 2016 Filing 25 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Guenther K. Fanter for Defendant Associated Materials, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
January 29, 2016 Filing 24 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Ernest E. Vargo for Defendant Associated Materials, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
January 29, 2016 Filing 23 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #21 , Brief #22 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Tricker, Edward)
January 29, 2016 Filing 22 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #21 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
January 29, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
January 4, 2016 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
December 30, 2015 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED TEXT ORDER granting #13 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Associated Materials, LLC answer or response due 1/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, ) Modified on 12/23/2015 to correct discrepancy (ARL, ).
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #11 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Window World, Inc. answer or response due 1/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Associated Materials, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Window World, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB, )
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, III, for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters and remains assigned to the undersigned for disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 22, 2015 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC.(Tricker, Edward)
December 22, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Edward H. Tricker on behalf of Defendant Associated Materials, LLC (Tricker, Edward)
December 22, 2015 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to January 29, 2016 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Window World, Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
December 18, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Steve A. Miller on behalf of Plaintiffs Mike Bendfeldt, Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt (Miller, Steve)
December 14, 2015 Filing 9 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Judson A. Welborn for Defendant Window World, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
December 14, 2015 Filing 8 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Jessica B. Vickers for Defendant Window World, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
December 14, 2015 Filing 7 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Natalie M. Rice for Defendant Window World, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
December 14, 2015 Filing 6 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Michael T. Medford for Defendant Window World, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC)
October 26, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Associated Materials, LLC and Window World, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
October 26, 2015 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Associated Materials, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Fortman, Jonathan)
October 26, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Window World, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Fortman, Jonathan)
October 16, 2015 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken assigned. (KLF)
October 16, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Associated Materials LLC, Window World, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3056177), by Attorney Jonathan E. Fortman on behalf of Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt, Mike Bendfeldt(Fortman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bendfeldt et al v. Window World, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bendfeldt
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Larry E. Welch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Muhr-Bendfeldt
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Represented By: Steve A. Miller
Represented By: Larry E. Welch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Window World, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Michael T. Medford
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Represented By: Jessica B. Vickers
Represented By: Natalie M. Rice
Represented By: Judson A. Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC
Represented By: Monica L. Freeman
Represented By: Edward H. Tricker
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Guenther K. Fanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?