Millard Gutter Company v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Millard Gutter Company
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00406
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 54). Being fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ordered: Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall pay their own costs and attorney fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that the progression of this case is suspended for 30 days. Counsel for the plaintiff shall submit a status report on or before March 22, 2018. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The parties shall mediate this matter within 60 days of the date of this order. The parties shall agree on a mediator and identify the mediator to the court within 14 days of the date of this order. If the parties ar e unable to agree on a mediator within 14 days, counsel shall contact the court to schedule a hearing or conference to resolve the matter. The progression of this case is suspended for 60 days. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy emailed to Special Master)(TCL)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that this matter is before the court on the recommendations of the Special Master. The court finds the recommendations should be adopted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Depositions shall commence beginning on and after June 5, 2017, and conclude no later than August 11, 2017. Deposition summaries are to be submitted to the Special Master by each party as the depositions are being taken rather than all at the end. Each party will submit whatever deposition summary they wish to the Special Master within two weeks after the taking of each respective deposition. Final arguments are scheduled before the Special Master on September 11, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. CDT in Courtroom No. 3, Roman Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SMN)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the recommendations of the Special Master. The court finds the recommendations should be adopted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall following the deadlines and discovery plan as set forth in this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Michael F. Kinney is appointed Special Master for the purpose of assisting the court in the resolution and management of this case. Mr. Kinney shall report to the court every 45 days and shall ultimately prepare findings and r ecommendations for submission to the court within six months of the date of this order. Upon receipt of this Order, and after conferring with the court, the Special Master shall set a time and place for a first meeting of counsel for the parties to be held within 21 days of the date of this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to Mr. Kinney and PACER Service Center as directed, copy to Operations Administrator)(TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millard Gutter Company v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard Gutter Company
Represented By: Theodore R. Boecker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?