Burton v. Frakes
Plaintiff: |
Karnell Burton |
Defendant: |
Scott Frakes |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv00417 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER that the Motion to Extend Time to File An Application for Certificate of Appealability and Brief in Support of the Application 44 is denied. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) AND Amended Petition (Filing No. 13 ) are dismissed with prejudice. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (GJG)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER that the Petitioner has showed sufficient cause to avoid the dismissal of his claim. The show-cause order is terminated. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Petitioner shall have until 3/3/2017 to show cause why his § 2254 Petition should not be dismissed as time-barred. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER that the Petitioner's motion for second extension of time (Filing 24 ) is granted. The Petitioner's reply brief to the Respondent's answer and brief is due on or before August 29, 2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 21 Petitioner's Motion to Extend. The Petitioner's reply brief to the Respondent's answer and brief is due on or before August 1, 2016. Ordered by Chief Judge David G. Kays. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Burton's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is denied as moot. Burton paid the filing fee on November 13, 2015. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By March 3, 2016, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an ans wer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 3, 2016: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The cle rk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 5, 2016: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?