Herrera v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Guillermo Herrera, III
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00426
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendants motion to compel, (Filing No. 90 ) is denied. Defendant's request for remedies is denied without prejudice to refiling at a later date. The telephonic conference scheduled for April 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. If counsel need to confer with the court on any case progression or scheduling matter, they can contact my chambers and set a conference call. Plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement the record, (Filing No. 97 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER:--Jury Trial set for 11/27/2017 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard.--Pretrial Conference set for 11 /13/2017 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case (Filing No. 14) to participate in the pretrial conference.--Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case (Filing No. 14) to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Rebuttal Expert Reports, (Filing No. 72 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Stipulated protective order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Herrera, III
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?