Haltom v. Parks et al
Plaintiff: John V. Haltom
Defendant: Stephanie Allison, Sharon Bartek, Marti Beard, Jason Bequette, Dr. Lisa Blankenau, Ashley Buck, Stanley Carlock, Dr. James C. Carmer, Jennie Cole-Mossman, Patricia Dinslage, Dr. Walter Duffy, Sam Funnah, Jeri Grachek, Salina Hardesty, Mark Heilman, Dr. Dan Hensleey, Dr. Ryan Herd, Dr. Gail M. Ihle, Christine Jones, Wendy Kaiser, David Kucera, Nicole Lemke, Holly Ludvik, Ralph Martinez, Bob Meier, Rebecca Norton, Barbara Onnen, Karen Parks, Jeremy Powers, Jane Prine, Dawn Rockey, Angela Ryan, Melissa Schmid, Sarah Siemek, Nanette Simmons, Michael Smith, Kate Steffen, Anthony Troester, Mr. Troyer, Wendy Waites and Ann Williams
Case Number: 8:2015cv00428
Filed: November 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that the plaintiff's motion to strike (filing 166 ) is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to process a single appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, encompassing each of the plaintiff's notices of appea l. The Clerk of the Court shall collect an appellate filing fee from the plaintiff of $505. The Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of this order to the Clerk of the Court for the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER that Christine Jones, Jane Prine, and Does I-VII are dismissed as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Hurd's motion for summary judgment (filing 125 ) is granted. Haltom's claims against Hurd are dismissed with prejudice. "Dr. Ryan Herd" is terminated as a party. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting the Cedars defendants' 115 Motion for Summary Judgment. Haltom's claims against the Cedars Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that MHA's motion for summary judgment (filing 101 ) is granted. Haltom's claims against MHA are dismissed with prejudice. "Mental Health Associates, LLC" is terminated as a party. MHA's motion to dismiss (filing 135 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff is ordered to show cause, on or before February 28, 2018, why the remaining unserved defendants should not be dismissed, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), for failure to serve process. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a show cause deadline of February 28, 2018. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER - that the motion to withdraw filed by L. Steven Grasz, as counsel of record for Defendant KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska, Inc. (Filing No. 131 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Deadline set for 7/25/2017.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1. The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (filing 93 ) is adopted. 2. The plaintiff's claims against the following defendants are dismissed for failure of service and want of prosecution:a. Sarah Siemek, DHHSb. Ashley Buck, DHHSc. Patricia Dinslage, Mental Health Associatesd. Dr. Jennie Cole-Mossman, Mental Health Associatese. Dr. Gail M. Ihle, Mental Health Associatesf. Holly Ludvik, KVC, Cedarsg. Dr. Dan Hensleey, Lakeside Physicianh. Wendy Kaiseri. Angela Ryanj. Rebecca Nortonk. Jeri Grachek Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The individually-named defendants' motions to dismiss are granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, a. Robert Troyer's motion to dismiss (filing 56 ) is denied. b. David Kucera's motion to dismiss (fili ng 30 ) is granted. c. James Carmer and Mental Health Associates' motion to dismiss (filing 41 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, to the extent that the defendant moves to dismiss Mental Health Associates, the motion is d enied. To the extent that the defendant moves to dismiss James Carmer, the motion is granted. d. Mental Health Associates' motion to dismiss is denied. e. Barbara Onnen's motion to dismiss (filing 27 ) is granted. f. Melissa Schmid&# 039;s motion to dismiss (filing 51 ) is denied. g. Lisa Blankenau's motion to dismiss (filing 57 ) is denied. h. Ryan Hurd's motion to dismiss (filing 48 ) is denied. 2. The non-governmental entities' motions to dismiss are granted. Specifically, a. KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska's motion to dismiss (filing 60 ) is granted. b. Alegent Creighton Health's motion to dismiss (filing 46 ) is granted. c. ORR Psychotherapy's motion to dismiss (filing 43 ) is granted. CASA and Dawn Rockey's motion to dismiss (filing 69) is granted. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to extend the service deadline, permit limited discovery, and stay the pending motions to dismiss (Filing No. 72 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Attorney Matthew B. Reilly's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Rebecca Nelson, (Filing No. 67 ) is granted. Defendants CASA and Dawn Rockey's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 45 ), Brief in Support of the Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 53 ), and Index of Evidence, (Filing No. 50 ) are stricken. Defendants CASA and Dawn Rockey shall file their Amended Motion to Dismiss and supporting documents on or before September 2, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to Withdraw as Attorney 62 and 63 . Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C., are withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Rebecca Norton, Dawn Rockey, Jeri Grachek, Wendy Kaiser, and Angela Ryan.- The Motion t o Strike the Filing 58 Answer to Amended Complaint, (Filing No. 64 ), is granted and, a. Filing 58 is stricken.b. Filing No. 65 , the Answer filed on behalf of Defendants Cedars Youth Services, Inc., Stephanie Allison, Sharon Bartek, Ma rti Beard, Jason Bequette, Sam Funnah, Salina Hardesty, Mark Heilman, Nicole Lemke, Ralph Martinez, Bob Meier, Karen Parks, Jeremy Powers, Nanette Simmons, Michael Smith, Anthony Troester, and Wendy Waites, (collectively, "Cedars Defendants"), is properly filed and is the operative answer on behalf of these defendants.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until 5/3/2016 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haltom v. Parks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Bartek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marti Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bequette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lisa Blankenau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Carlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James C. Carmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Cole-Mossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Dinslage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Walter Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Funnah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Grachek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salina Hardesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dan Hensleey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ryan Herd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gail M. Ihle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kucera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Lemke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Ludvik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Onnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Prine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Rockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Siemek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanette Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Troester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Waites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John V. Haltom
Represented By: Kevin L. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?