Harris v. State of Nebraska

Petitioner: William Travion Harris
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2015cv00438
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - By January 18, 2018, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the followin g text: January 18, 2018: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 20, 2018: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
October 18, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the petitioner is given until October 28, 2016, to file his status report regarding his reinstated appeal. Petitioner's additional status reports shall be filed every 60 days thereafter without fail. A subsequent failure to file a status report may result in dismissal of this case with or without prejudice. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/28/2016.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MLF, )
June 1, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Respondent shall respond to Petitioner's MOTION to Stay 22 on or before 6/15/2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
May 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Having considered the very helpful response of the Respondent, Petitioner's motion for leave to allow for additional documents (filing no. 17 ) is denied as moot as Respondent has made the requested documents availabl e to Petitioner. On or before the close of business on May 31, 2016, Petitioner shall do one of the following two things: A. File a motion in this Court asking that the court stay and abey these proceedings in order for Petitioner to file a prompt motion to reinstate his postconviction appeal by filing such a motion in the state district court; or, B. File a notice in this Court that Petitioner wishes to proceed with this federal action without seeking to reinstate his postconviction appeal. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Case Management Deadline set for 6/1/2016: to review the status of this case) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 7, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Respondent shall file a response with such records as are necessary and a brief no later than April 21, 2016. The Court will not address any motion for summary judgment or answer filed in this case by the Respondent until the Responden t addresses the motion to clarify and be more specific. All previous deadlines that have been set by the prior order on initial review (filing no. 9 ) are canceled pending resolution of Petitioner's motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
February 23, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Upon initial review of the Petition 1 , the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 5 is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 8, 2016: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summar y judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 10, 2016: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
December 30, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Travion Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?