Langford v. Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Howard L. Langford
Defendant: Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00016
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (filing 56 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the above-captioned case is stayed. A status report shall be filed by January 2, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that plaintiff's motion to amend 22 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to his motion, shall be filed on or before October 5, 2016. Defendant shall file its response to the amended complaint within 14 days after it is filed. Plaintiff's motion to extend 23 is granted, and he is given until October 21, 2016 to file his Rule 26 (f) Report. Plaintiff's failure to timely file his own Rule 26(f) Report may result in dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute and without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MBM)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the parties shall review the undersigned magistrate judge's posted at Civil Case Management Practices. Plaintiff and counsel for the defendant shall confer and, on or before August 3, 2016, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 ( f)) Report. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before July 27, 2016 a party shall contact my chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 10 The Report and Recommendation of the United States Bankruptcy Judge recommending withdrawal of the reference is adopted. Reference of this case to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn in its entirety. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1); The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall close this case for statistical purpose s; and The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver, or send electronically, the Court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?