Storovich v. Raemisch
Petitioner: Jerry Storovich
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2016cv00024
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 41 ) is granted. The clerk's office is directed to provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner is directed to submit the filing and docket fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this ma tter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 30, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Petitioner's motion to substitute respondent (See Filing No. 12 ) is granted. The clerk's office is directed to update the court's records to reflect that Grant County, Nebraska and the State of Nebraska are t he named respondents in this action. The clerk of court is further directed to send a copy of this order to Rich Raemisch and the Nebraska Attorney General. By August 8, 2016, Respondents must file a motion for summary judgment or state court record s in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 8, 2016: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for sum mary judgment. If Respondents elect to file a motion for summary judgment, the following procedures must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. If Respondents elect to file an answer, the following procedures must be followed by Respondents and Petitioner. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 7, 2016: check for Respondents' answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Copy mailed as directed)(LAC)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -This matter is before the court on Petitioners Motion for Status. (Filing No. 14 ). Petitioner is advised that his case is under consideration and a ruling will be made in the normal course of the court's business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By April 11, 2016, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 11, 2016: deadline for Respondent to file st ate court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the following procedures must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the fol lowing procedures must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 9, 2016: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storovich v. Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Storovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?