Brandy v. Select Food Mart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judie Brandy
Defendant: John Does 1 - 2 and Select Food Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00048
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on January 4, 2017, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon either party or their attorneys, as is appropriate, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that on October 20, 2016, the court informed the parties by letter of their obligation to meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and to file a written report of their meeting. See Filing No. 17. IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall re port to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on December 12, 2016, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff has until the close of business on May 31, 2016, to file with the Clerk of Court evidence of service or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as against the defendant for failure to prosecute by providing an explanation for the delay in seeking service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandy v. Select Food Mart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judie Brandy
Represented By: Jeremy C. Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Food Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?