Goings v. Hillsborough Pointe L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Dwaine Goings
Defendant: Hillsborough Pointe L.L.C., Shawn Knudsen and Schwalb Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00064
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice is granted, and that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FIFTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - that the Unopposed Motion to Extend Progression Order Deadline (Filing No. 42 ) is granted, in part, as follows: Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Extend. FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER: This matter is before the court on the unopposed motion to extend progression order deadlines 40 . The Jury Trial is continued to January 22, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtro om 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for January 5, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JLS, )
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Extend THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER: This matter is before the court on the unopposed motion to extend progression order deadlines 36 . The Jury Trial is continued to December 11, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtro om 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for November 20, 2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JLS, )
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/5/2016 at 08:30 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. The parties may participate by telephone by notifying Judge Strom's office prior to said date. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goings v. Hillsborough Pointe L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwaine Goings
Represented By: Sara A. McCue
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough Pointe L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwalb Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?