Basra, et al v. Ecklund Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Inderjeet Basra and Dilshaan S. Rehal
Defendant: Ecklund Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00083
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBIT SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. ( Exhibit Deadline set for 1/25/2019.) Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED ( Exhibit Deadline set for 1/18/2019.) Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial, ECF No. 193 , filed by Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc., is denied. The Motion to Extend Time to Post Supersedeas Bond, ECF No. 213 , filed by Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc., is denied as moot. The stay of execution of the judgment is lifted, and, pursuant to the Court's Order, ECF No. 208 , no proceedings may be brought to enforce the Judgment, until 30 days after the date of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER - Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc.'s, Motion to Amend Order, ECF No. 209 , is construed as a motion for an extension of time to file the supersedeas bond. Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc.'s Motion, ECF No. 209 , is granted. On or before November 17, 2017, Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc., shall file a supersedeas bond, issued by a surety or insurance company with an A.M. Best Rating of A++ or higher, with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $1,237,500. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy e-mailed to Finance) (KLF)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER sustaining Motion in Limine 148 in part and the objections are otherwise overruled. Sustaining Motion in Limine 154 in part and the objections are otherwise overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KMG)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION - This matter is scheduled for trial the week of August 14, 2017, and the first day of trial will be Tuesday, August 15, 2017, subject only to the Court's need to commence any previously scheduled criminal trial in which a Speedy Trial Act deadline exists. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider, ECF No. 125, is denied; and Plaintiffs' Motion for a hearing and oral argument, ECF No. 130, is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying Defendant Ecklund Logistics, Inc.'s Motion in Limine, ECF No. 96 and Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 to #5, ECF No. 100 -1 through 100 -5 as stated. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Issuance of Subpoena for Production of Documents to Affinity Health System (Filing No. 102 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is not less than 3 days, not more than 10 days, and probably about 6 days. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions and Second Motion to Compel Discovery (Filing No. 69 ) is granted in part, and in part denied, as set forth above. Defendant shall amend its verification for each set of its answers to interrogatories to comply with the signature and verification requirements of Rules 33(b)(3) and (5) on or before April 10, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Stipulation. The deadline for the Plaintiffs' disclosure of expert witnesses is extended to January 20, 2017. The deadline for the defendant's disclosure of expert witnesses is extended to March 3, 2017. The deadline for the disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses is extended to March 10, 2017. The defendant shall comply with the court's December 22, 2016, Order (# 53 ) ruling on the Plaintiffs' First Motion to Compel Discovery, by producing documents and serving amended responses for receipt by Plaintiffs on or before January 10, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Plaintiffs' First Motion to Compel Discovery and for Modification of Final Progression Order (Filing No. 28 ) is granted, in part. By or before January 13, 2017, Defendant shall: 1. Produce full, complete, and correct responses to In terrogatory Nos. 5(c) and (d), 7, and 12(a)-(g); 2. Serve amended responses to Requests for Production of Document Numbers 10, 11, 12, and 13, for the time period from January 1, 2012, to the present; and 3. Serve amended responses to Requests for P roduction of Document Numbers 4, 7, 8, 19-47, 49-75, 77-83, and 93, (a) identifying Defendant's efforts to obtain and provide responsive documents; (b) indicating whether responsive documents do or do not exist; and (c) indicating whether all responsive documents have been produced after a diligent and good faith effort to locate and identify responsive materials. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG, )
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 37 Stipulation of the parties regarding certain deadlines, as set out in this order. The 4/17/2017 pretrial conference and the 5/16/2017 trial dates remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basra, et al v. Ecklund Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inderjeet Basra
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilshaan S. Rehal
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecklund Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?