Reefer Systems, Inc. et al v. Southard Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Reefer Systems, Inc. and William Willett
Defendant: Executive Financial Services, Inc., Kelly Finnell and Southard Financial, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00093
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The joint stipulation of the parties (filing 65 ) is approved and adopted. This action is dismissed with prejudicein its entirety. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
October 28, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion of Jill Robb Ackerman and Baird Holm LLP to withdraw as counsel for defendants Kelly Finnell and Executive Financial Services, Inc., 55 is granted. The clerk of Court shall remove the names from CM/ECF as counsel for defendants Kelly Finnell and Executive Financial Services, Inc. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
October 18, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that the planning conference will be rescheduled after counsel advises the Court whether or not the matter is successfully mediated. The parties shall advise the Court within ten days after the date of any mediation. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
October 3, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The stipulated amendment 38 is approved and adopted. The parties had until September 9, 2016, to make initial disclosures. A scheduling conference with the undersigned will be held on: Wednesday, October 12, 2016, at 8:15 a.m. in Suite 3 190, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, to establish a final progression order for this case. The parties may participate by telephone by notifying Judge Strom's office prior to said date. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
September 8, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - that the documents and information produced during the course of discovery herein shall be protected against inappropriate disclosure in accordance with the following terms and conditions. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
September 6, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 23 . The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' breach of contr act claim is granted. Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim is dismissed. The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' professional malpractice claim is denied. The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' ; negligent misrepresentation claim is denied. The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' fraudulent concealment claim is denied. The Finnell defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(7) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reefer Systems, Inc. et al v. Southard Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Finnell
Represented By: Richard M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southard Financial, LLC
Represented By: V. Gene Summerlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reefer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: Ruth A. Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Willett
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: Ruth A. Horvatich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?