Rasmussen Air & Gas Energy, Inc. v. Ingersoll-Rand Company
Plaintiff: Rasmussen Air & Gas Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00103
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER : Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr.. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - that the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Dates (Filing No. 54 ) is granted. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Robert F. Rossiter Jr., United States District Judge, at the Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on December 11, 2017, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be he ld before the undersigned magistrate judge on November 27, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint report by June 30, 2017, advising as to the outcome of mediation. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline using the following text: "June 30, 2017: Mediation Status Report Due." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The court preliminarily finds that Defendant's language for paragraph 17 of the parties proposed protective order is appropriate. If either party believes the court should resolve the dispute over paragraph 17 by formal motion, such motion shall be filed on or before July 1, 2016, with any response due on or before July 5, 2016. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Absent the filing a formal motion by July 1, 2016, or the parties notice befo re July 1, 2016 that they now agree that the proposed protective order, with Defendants proposed language, may be entered, the court will enter a protective order as set forth in the attached copy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Counsel shall confer and, on or before May 23, 2016, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report, a copy of which can be found at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms in Word and WordPerfect format. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before May 16, 2016 a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/20/2016. Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen Air & Gas Energy, Inc. v. Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: James M. Sulentic
Represented By: Carol A. Svolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasmussen Air & Gas Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hoffman
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?