Johnson v. Frakes et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandon R. Johnson |
Defendant: |
Scott Frakes, Hargreaves, John Does-1-15, Mario Peart, Diane Sabatka-Rine and Kara Simpson |
Case Number: |
8:2016cv00155 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 12, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to file an amended complaint that sets forth cognizable claims for relief. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Plaintiff is again warned that if his amended complaint sets forth unrelatedclaims, and the court decides severance of the claims is appropriate, Plaintiff will be required to prosecute unrelated claims in separate actions and he will be required to pay a separate filing fee for each separate action.***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/5/2016:Check for amended complaint) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $116.97 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in res ponse to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course ofbusiness. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/12/2016: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?