Meyer v. Hansen et al
Petitioner: |
Darrel G. Meyer |
Respondent: |
Scott Frakes and Brad Hansen |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2016cv00166 |
Filed: |
April 14, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. By July 1, 2016, Respondent must file a motion for summa ry judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 1, 2016: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth within the order must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. By July 1, 2016, Respondent must file all state court records that are relevant to the cognizable claims. See, e.g., Rule 5(c)-(d) of the Rules Governing Sectio n 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Those records must be contained in a separate filing entitled: "Designation of State Court Records in Support of Answer." No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Ru le 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/1/2016: deadline for respondent to file state court records in support of an swer or motion for summary judgment). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/1/2016: check for respondent's answer and separate brief). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER denying the Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Darrell G. Meyer shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 by May 18, 2016, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a wr itten motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/18/2016: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?