Oberembt v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julie A. Oberembt
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00171
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, ECF No. 35, is approved; The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice; Any pending motions are terminated; and The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - On or before August 25, 2017, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compli ance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (GJG)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines (# 30 ) is granted. The Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (# 28 ) is amended to extend the following deadlines as set forth in this order. All other deadlines, including the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial, remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - THEREFORE, FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order (Filing No. 23 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oberembt v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: April N. Hook
Represented By: James G. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Oberembt
Represented By: E. Terry Sibbernsen
Represented By: Julie D. Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?