Valentine v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Valentine
Defendant: Chief of Omaha Police Schmader, City of Omaha and Unknown John Jane Doe Police
Case Number: 8:2016cv00174
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Plaintiff will not be granted permission to appeal in forma pauperis from the Court's prior denial of her motion to appeal in forma pauperis from the Court's denial of her motion for summary judgment, because t he Memorandum and Order (ECF No. 47 in Case No. 8:16cv131 and ECF No. 49 in Case No. 8:16cv174) denying the motions is not a final order or judgment and is not subject to appeal. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:The Plaintiff will not be granted permission to appeal in forma pauperis from the Court's denial of her motions for summary judgment, because the Memorandum and Order (ECF No. 47 in Case No. 8:16cv131 and ECF No. 49 in Case No. 8:16cv174) denying the motions is not a final order or judgment and is not subject to appeal. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by June 23, 2016, that states a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will resu lt in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: June 23, 2016 check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 5 ) is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter with out further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: May 20, 2016: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form) (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Omaha Police Schmader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown John Jane Doe Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?