Native American Faith Group of the Nebraska State Penitentiary, et al v. Frakes, et al
Plaintiff: Native American Faith Group of the Nebraska State Penitentiary and Michael Joseph Sims
Defendant: Randy Bartelt, Richard Cruickshank, Scott R. Frakes, Timothy Kramer, Sharon Pettid, Religious Study Committee Members, Michael Rothwell and Diane Sabatke-Rhine
Case Number: 8:2016cv00326
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) motion (Filing No. 22 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's claims for prospective injunctive relief may proceed and service is now warranted against the following Defendants in their official capacities; To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the Court will provide. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the Court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the Court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with copies of the Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the summons and Complaint withou t payment of costs or fees. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on a Defendant within 90 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such Defendant. Once serv ice of process has been completed, the court will schedule a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Filing 5 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies and forms mailed as directed)(SLP)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Sims' Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP 2 is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $16.76 within 30 days unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a writ ten motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff Sims institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerks office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff Sims' institution. Plaintiff Sims is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff Sims' ; case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff Sims' claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of b usiness. Native American faith Group of the Nebraska State Penitentiary is dismissed from this matter. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/12/2016:initial partial filing fee payment due.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native American Faith Group of the Nebraska State Penitentiary, et al v. Frakes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Bartelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Pettid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Religious Study Committee Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Sabatke-Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native American Faith Group of the Nebraska State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?