August 5, 2021 |
Filing
321
ORDER TO DESTROY - Counsel for both the plaintiff and the defendants notified the court on August 4, 2021 that they wish the following exhibits held by the court in this matter to be destroyed from the jury trial on July 22-26, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
July 27, 2021 |
Filing
320
JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Opinion, Judgment, and Mandate entered herein by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals, Filing Nos. 317 , 318 and 319 , Judgment in this case is hereby entered in favor of Union Pacific. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|
March 17, 2020 |
Filing
308
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to review costs, Filing No. 306, and objection to bill of costs, Filing No. 296, are denied. Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees, Filing Nos. 281 and 282, are granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. Plaintiff is awarded $100,000.00 in attorney fees. The Court awards $100,000.00 in attorneys' fees; $34,793.34 in expenses; and $11,761.56 in costs. A final judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
July 19, 2019 |
Filing
248
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motion in limine, Filing No. 214 , is denied and granted as set forth herein. Plaintiff's motion in limine, Filing No. 217 , is denied and granted as set forth herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC)
|
November 26, 2018 |
Filing
207
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 165 , is denied. Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to defendant Kathleen Hughes, Filing No. 168 , is granted. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, Filing No. 171 , is denied. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss parties, Tracy Scott and Kathleen Hughes, Filing No. 175 , is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC)
|
October 10, 2018 |
Filing
202
ORDER that the Motion to Intervene (Filing No. 197 ) is granted as set forth above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
May 10, 2018 |
Filing
150
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The motion to quash by the United States, Filing No. 104, is granted; The objections of the plaintiff, Filing No. 134, are overruled; and The order of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 131, is affirmed and adopted in its entirety. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
|
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
149
FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
142
ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motion for leave to offer additional evidentiary material regarding the objections to the magistrate judge's order, Filing Nos. 136 and 140 is granted and deemed filed instanter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoenas (Filing No. 111 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
|
February 5, 2018 |
Filing
130
THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Deposition Deadline - April 23, 2018. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Filing
128
SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 127 Joint Motion to Extend Progression Order Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (SLP)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
108
AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - granting 107 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Fees, Costs, and a Jury Instruction Associated with Disproving Defendants' Responses to Requests for Admissions (Filing No. 57 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, Filing No. 38 , is granted. Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and stay, Filing No. 43 , is denied. Plaintiff's motion to strike the reply brief, Filing No. 39 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying 12 the defendants' Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration without prejudice to reassertion after limited discovery to be completed within sixty days; and granting 16 the defendants' Motion to File Reply Brief Out of Time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|