Coach, Inc. v. Quinn et al
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc. and Coach, Inc.
Defendant: Fawaz Mumtaz and Raja D. Quinn
Case Number: 8:2016cv00338
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Coach's motion for nontaxable costs and attorney's fees (filing 60 ) is granted. The Court awards nontaxable costs and attorney's fees in the amount of $7,500.00. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Coach's motion for default judgment (filing 49 ) is granted. Judgment will be entered for Coach, and against Quinn, in the amount of $5,000.00. Quinn is permanently enjoined from using Coach's marks, or any othe r mark alone or in connection with another word or symbol which is confusingly similar to Coach's marks, or which is likely to cause confusion or mistake or to deceive. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that Plaintiff's written submission in support of its damages and attorney fees claims shall be filed on or before January 8, 2018. Any response by Defendant Quinn shall be filed within 21 days thereafter. If Defendant files a response, Plaintiff may file a reply on or before seven days thereafter. (Case Management Deadline set for 2/5/2018.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to defendant)(CCB)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on its own motion. On or before June 9, 2017, Plaintiff shall move for the appropriate remedy under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's 30 Findings and Recommendation; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Raja D. Quinn, d/b/a Wholesale Outlet a/k/a Raja Dejourn Fashions & Fawaz Mumtaz Retail Outlet's default. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Defendant Quinn's motion, (Filing No. 21 ), is denied. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on October 12, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss case scheduling. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. v. Quinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ambika Behal
Represented By: Jason A. Kempf
Represented By: S. Patrick McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Ambika Behal
Represented By: Jason A. Kempf
Represented By: S. Patrick McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fawaz Mumtaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja D. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?