Coach, Inc. et al v. Overton
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc. and Coach, Inc.
Defendant: James R. Overton, III
Case Number: 8:2016cv00339
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This action is dismissed, with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER - In accordance with the Court's prior Order (Filing No. 53 ), Plaintiffs Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc. (hereinafter collectively referred to as "Coach") and Defendant James R. Overton, III a/k/a Jay Overton, individually and d/b/a Lantex LLC a/k/a Fresh Wear (hereinafter "Mr. Overton") (together, "the Parties") agree to the terms of this Agreed Protective Order.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 50 Motion to Amend. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a joint proposed protective order to submit to the Court for its approval. After approval of the joint protec tive order, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiffs his tax returns for the last five (5) years, and any other financial documentation or statements relevant and necessary to evaluation of a settlement offer. Depositions due June 29, 2018. The Fina l Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for November 26, 2018, 10:00 a.m. in chambers. A four (4) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of December 11, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Mr. Overton has properly received notice of the above-captioned case. On or before March 27, 2017, Mr. Overton shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. On or before March 27, 2017, Mr. Overton shall provide the Cle rk of Court with his current contact information, including his current physical address, telephone number, and e-mail address (if available). The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Overton at the following addresses: James R. Overton III, 3217 Ohio Street, Omaha, NE 68111, James R. Overton III, 3929 Ames Avenue, Omaha, NE 68111, James R. Overton III, 1436 North 20th Street, Omaha, NE 68102. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (KLF)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time to February 10, 2017, to file with the Clerk of Court evidence of valid service or a properly executed waiver of service for the defendant in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The plaintiffs shall have until on or before December 23, 2016, to file with the Clerk of Court evidence of valid service for the defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ambika Behal
Represented By: Jason A. Kempf
Represented By: S. Patrick McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Ambika Behal
Represented By: Jason A. Kempf
Represented By: S. Patrick McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Overton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?