State of Nebraska v. STABL, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Defendant: Ann Johnson, Leon Johnson, Lant, Inc. and STABL, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00351
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - The Joint Motion to Consolidate (Filing No. 31 in Case No. 8:16CV233; Filing No. 48 in Case No. 8:16CV351) is granted, in part. To the extent that the motion to consolidate asks the cases be consolidated for trial, it is denied without pre judice to reassertion at a later date. The two above-captioned cases are consolidated for purposes of discovery and pretrial management only. Case No. 8:16CV233 will be designated as the "Lead Case" and Case No. 8:16CV351 will be designa ted as "Member Case." The court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Cas e. The parties are instructed to file documents related to discovery (except those described in paragraph 5) in the Lead Case and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parti es may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. If a party believes an item in addition to those describ ed in paragraph 4 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in one or more member cases. The motion must be filed in all the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. The Rule 26(f) Report, currently due on or before March 15, 2017, shall encompass both cases. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - Defendants will respond to the Amended Complaint, ECF No. 15 , on or before December 12, 2016. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Make More Definite and Certain, ECF No. 30 , is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Moot (Filing No. 20 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 13 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Nebraska v. STABL, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Johnson
Represented By: William G. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Johnson
Represented By: William G. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lant, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STABL, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Dittrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Justin D. Lavene
Represented By: Emily K. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?