United States of America v. Kroeger
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mark S. Kroeger
Case Number: 8:2016cv00355
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The petitioner's Notice of Dismissal (Filing No. 8 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall cancel the hearing previously scheduled for September 23, 2016, and close the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The allegations in the Petition (Filing 1 ) are deemed admitted. The Respondent shall comply with the summons attached to the Petition by September 1, 2016. The United States shall promptly inform the Court of the Respondent's full comp liance or non-compliance with the summons. If the Respondent fails to comply with the summons by September 1, 2016, the Respondent shall appear before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge in the District Court of the United States for the D istrict of Nebraska, in Courtroom No. 7, Second Floor, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska on the 23rd day of September, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of the Court� 39;s Order of July 19, 2016 (Filing 3 ) and of this Order, or to purge himself of contempt by providing the summonsed testimony and documents. The Clerk's Office mail a copy of this Order to the Respondent at the following address: Mr. Mark Kro eger, 6219 North 155th Street, Omaha, NE 68116. If the Respondent fails to comply with the summons or appear as ordered herein, the undersigned will submit a Report and Recommendation to the District Court that a Contempt Order be entered in connection with which the Respondent shall be sentenced to the custody of the Attorney General of the United States until such time as he shall purge himself of contempt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (KLF)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Respondent appear before the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska, Roman L. Hruska Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on the 22nd day of August, 2016, in Courtroom 7, to show cause why Respondent should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service Summons served on March 31, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?