Alton & Southern Railway Co. v. Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Plaintiff: Alton & Southern Railway Co.
Defendant: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Case Number: 8:2016cv00360
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Withdraw Exhibits or to Show Cause Why Exhibits Should Not be Destroyed.Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLF, )
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the plaintiff has until the close of business on November 16, 2016, to file evidence of service for the defendant or show cause why this case should not be dismissed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying [Filing No. 2] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JJM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alton & Southern Railway Co. v. Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton & Southern Railway Co.
Represented By: Patricia O. Kiscoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?