Fleet Truck Sales, Inc. v. Quality Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fleet Truck Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Celadon Group, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC and Quality Equipment Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00366
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 113 , filed by Defendant Celadon Group, Inc., is granted. The Objection to Index and Motion to Strike, ECF No. 121 , filed by Defendant Celadon Group, Inc., is denied as moot. Celadon Group, Inc., is dismissed from this action. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 116 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline and Move Trial Date. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to August 10, 2018, to file a response to the Defendant Celadon Group, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment 113 . Celedon Group may file a reply seven days thereafter. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is rescheduled for November 26, 2018, at 11:00 a.m., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United Sta tes Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. The three day jury trial is rescheduled to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of December 11, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MBM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE that the Joint Motion for Progression Dates and Deadlines (Filing No. 105 ) is granted, as set forth below: Deposition Deadline- May 18, 2018. The Final Pretrial Conference with t he undersigned magistrate judge is set for September 7, 2018, at 11:00 a.m., in my chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A three (3) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of September 18, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 67 , filed by Defendants Celadon Group, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, and Quality Equipment Leasing, LLC, is granted, in part, as follows: a. Plaintiff Fleet Truck Sales, Inc., is limited to seeking liquidated damages under the September purchase agreements. b. Quality Equipment Leasing, LLC, is dismissed from this action. c. Plaintiff Fleet Truck Sales, Inc.'s, claim for breach of oral contract is dismissed, with pre judice. d. Plaintiff Fleet Truck Sales, Inc., is not entitled to the equitable remedy of piercing the corporate veil. The Motion is otherwise denied. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, ECF No. 79 , filed by Plaintiff Fleet Truck Sales, Inc., is denied. The Motions to Strike, ECF Nos. 82 & 92 , filed by Plaintiff Fleet Truck Sales, Inc., are denied. The Motion to Exclude, ECF No. 89 , filed by Defendants is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment and to Stay Progression Order (Filing No. 74 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 67 ) shall be filed on or before September 29, 2017. Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary J udgment (Filing No. 67 ) shall be filed on or before October 13, 2017. The Final Pretrial Conference set for March 19, 2018, and Trial set to commence the week of April 17, 2018, are canceled, and will be re-set, if necessary, by further order of the Court. All other remaining deadlines set forth in the Order Amending Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 65 ), shall be stayed until further order of the Court. Within fourteen (14) days of the Court's ruling on the Motion f or Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 67 ), the parties shall meet and confer to discuss whether mediation is appropriate. If the parties determine mediation is not appropriate, the parties shall jointly submit to the undersigned magistrate judge a proposed amended progression order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 64 the Joint Motion to Amend. Deposition deadline is 11/17/2017. The pretrial conference will be held in the chambers of the assigned Magistrate Judge on 3/19/2018 at 9:30 A.M. The jury trial before Chief Judge Smith Camp is set for the week of 4/17/2018 at 8:30 AM, Courtroom 2, 3rd Floor of the Hruska Federal Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER EXTENDING PROGRESSION ORDER DEADLINE granting 59 Motion to Amend. Motions for Summary Judgment. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than July 31, 2017. Deposition Deadline. All depositions, whether or not they are int ended to be used at trial, shall be completed by July 14, 2017. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. The deadline for defendants' disclosure regarding expert witnesses is extended to May 26, 2017. Plaintiff's deadline for rebuttal experts is extended to June 16, 2017. All other deadlines set in the court's Order (# 41 ) shall remain as scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleet Truck Sales, Inc. v. Quality Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celadon Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Companies, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Equipment Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleet Truck Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Jones
Represented By: Emily J. Wischnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?