Nelson v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: H. Lundahl Telford
Defendant: Susan Aukema, D. Christinsen, Does 1-10, Jeffrey A. Donnell, Pamella Gee, Law Offices of Sundahl, Powers, Kapp & Martin, Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company and George E. Powers
308) 832-6662 (fax: Lisa Nelson
Case Number: 8:2016cv00368
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Filing No. 62 , Defendant Jeffrey A. Donnell's motion to substitute Tori R. A. Kricken, in her official capacity as District Court Judge, Second Judicial District, Albany County, Wyoming, as a party defendant in place of Judge Donnell is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk of court is hereby directed to make all sealed documents filed in the above captioned cases available, upon request, to Assistant U.S. States Attorney Jan Sharp and Assistant U.S. Attorney Alan Everett, or any law enforcement officer acting pursuant to their direction. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that the Clerk is directed to file the attached e-mail together with the document attached to the e-mail and the documents that were faxed to the clerk's office. The Clerk does not have the original documents but only e-mailed and/or faxed copies. With the foregoing in mind, IT IS ORDERED that the attached documents which are not originals shall be filed as one attachment to this order. The request to seal these documents is denied. The person purporting to be Mr. Christensen should n ot attempt to file any further pleadings in this case. The Clerk is directed to change both the physical address and the e-mail address as requested by "Dillon Christensen." If the person purporting to be "Dillon Christensen" wish es in the future to advise that he/she has changed an e-mail or physical address, a letter bearing an original pen and ink signature should be sent to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to provide a copy of the letter to thepro se law clerk.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se parties)(JLS, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the undersigned has referred two of the above-captioned actions to the United States Attorney. Therefore, in the interest of judicial economy, all the cases captioned above will be stayed until further order of the court. Th e clerk of court is hereby directed to terminate all pending motions in these cases for statistical purposes. The motions are terminated without prejudice to reassertion at the time the stay is lifted in these actions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(JLS, ) Modified on 10/4/2016 to correct typographical error.(JLS, ).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court is in receipt of documents mailed to the court by H. Lundahl Telford. The clerk of court is directed to scan these documents and file them as a sealed attachment to this order. The order and attachment shall be fil ed in each of the above-captioned cases. The clerk of court is further directed to keep the original documents received from Ms. Telford under seal in the court vault. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (JLS, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2016: # 1 Sealed Attachment) (JLS, ).
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant D. Christinsen and Plaintiffs Lisa Nelson and H. Lundahl Telford are ordered to appear before the undersigned United States district judge, in Courtroom No. 2, Robert V. Denney United States Courthouse and Federal Bui lding, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska, on September 19, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. Failure to appear as ordered may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the imposition of monetary sanctions, barring one or more of the summoned litigants from prosecuting or defending cases in this court, and dismissal with prejudice of the claims or defenses of one or more of the summoned litigants. The other parties to this action are not required to attend the hearing, but may appear if they so choose. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant D. Christinsen and Plaintiff Lisa Nelson are ordered to appear before the undersigned United States district judge, in Courtroom No. 2, Robert V. Denney United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial M all North, Lincoln, Nebraska, on September 19, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. Failure to appear as ordered may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the imposition of monetary sanctions, barring one or more of the summoned litigan ts from prosecuting or defending cases in this court, and dismissal with prejudice of the claims or defenses of one or more of the summoned litigants. The other parties to this action are not required to attend the hearing, but may appear if they so choose. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG) Modified on 8/19/2016 to correct entry to reflect copy e-mailed and not mailed to pro se party (GJG).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Aukema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Christinsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Donnell
Represented By: Jesse B. Naiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamella Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Sundahl, Powers, Kapp & Martin
Represented By: Jonathan J. Papik
Represented By: Andrew D. Strotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Tjaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Powers
Represented By: Jonathan J. Papik
Represented By: Andrew D. Strotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
308) 832-6662 (fax: Lisa Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Lundahl Telford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?