Brown v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
Defendant: William Becker, Shannon Black, Department of Health and Human Services, Cindy Dykeman, Lisa Laurell, Kyle Malone and Courtney Philips
Case Number: 8:2016cv00377
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that an Amended Judgment shall be entered, after which Plaintiff has 30 days to file a notice of appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 83 Motion to Amend the judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(CCB)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that the pretrial conference is continued pending further order of the court. If this case is not fully resolved by summary judgment, within ten (10) days after the summary judgment ruling, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to re-schedule the pretrial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that the Defendants' Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference (Filing No. 76 ) is granted. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for rescheduling of the Final Pretrial Conference, which is currently set for February 1, 2018. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall terminate Plaintiff's Objection (Filing No. 71 ) as a pending motion, and docket such Objection as a Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 61 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for an Enlargement of Time (Filing No. 68 ) is granted, and Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 61 ) shall be filed on or before November 22, 2017. Defendants may reply to Plaintiffs response within the time allowed by NECivR 7.1. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 57 ) of the court's prior denial (Filing No. 56 ) of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery of Documents (Filing No. 51 ) is granted ONLY as it pertains to R equest for Production No. 4 (Filing No. 51 at CM/ECF p. 4). Specifically, Defendants shall provide to Plaintiff copies of Plaintiff's gender evaluation done by Defendant Shannon Black and Sanat Roy (Program Psychiatrist) on August 12, 2016, as well as all written staff statements and notes regarding Plaintiff in the "S.O. group incident involving Lisa Laurell on September 20, 2016." Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 57 ) is otherwise denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 58 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery(Filing No. 50 ) and Addendum to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery (Filing No. 51 ) are denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 42 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Filing No. 44 ) in which to serve interrogatories on Defendants is granted, and Pl aintiff shall serve such interrogatories by July 14, 2017. An amended progression order shall be issued extending all deadlines by 30 days. Plaintiff is cautioned that the court will not tolerate multiple requests to extend the deadlines contained in the amended progression order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss (Filing 23 ) Plaintiff's only remaining 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim against the Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services for prospective injunctive relief is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. C iv. P. 12(b)(6), and defendant Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services is dismissed from this case. The Motion to Dismiss (Filing 25 ) defendant Courtney Philips in her official capacity for improper service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and (5) is DENIED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the time in which Plaintiff may serve defendant Courtney Philips in her official capacity with process is extended. For service of process on defendant Courtney Philips in her official capacity, the Clerk of the Court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for defendant Courtney Philips using the address "Office of the Nebraska Attorney General, 2115 State Capitol, Lincoln, NE 68509," and forward th em together with a copy of the Complaint (Filing 1 ), the Supplemental Complaint (Filing [1-1]), the court's order on initial review (Filing 8 ), and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall se rve defendant Courtney Philips in her official capacity at the office of the Nebraska Attorney General, 2115 State Capitol, Lincoln, NE 68509. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(j)(2); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-510.02 (Reissue 2016). The United S tates Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. Plaintiff's motion (Filing 29 ) for an extension of time in which to respond to Defendants' discovery requests is GRANTED, and Plaintiff need n ot respond to any discovery requests issued prior to the court's progression order, which will be entered after all defendants have answered. Plaintiff's motion for protective order (Filing 33 ) is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Filing 30 ) is granted, and Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Filings 23 & 25 ) shall be filed on or before March 15, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Defense Counsel (Filing No. 17 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 18 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargemen t of Time (Filing No. 27 ) is denied in part and granted in part as follows: Plaintiff's request to extend the time in which she must answer discovery requests is denied, and Plaintiff's request for additional time within which to r espond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Filing No. 23 ; Filing No. 25 ) is granted. Plaintiff may file her response to such motions on or before March 6, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Filing No. 13 ) is denied without prejudice to bringing such claims in a separate action. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF) Modified on 12/20/2016 to correct text (KLF).
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 9 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against the DHHS and all other defendants in their official capacities are dismissed as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief as agai nst defendants Black, Malone, Becker, Dykeman, and Laurell in their individual and official capacities are dismissed as moot. Plaintiff's defamation claim against all defendants is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. To the extent Plaintiff attempts to assert a § 1983 claim that the defendants failed to respond to her grievances and complaints in a timely fashion, such claim is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be gra nted. This case may proceed to service of process as to the following claims: (A) claims for prospective injunctive relief against the DHHS and defendant Philips in her official capacity and (B) claims for monetary and declaratory relief against d efendants Philips, Black, Malone, Becker, Dykeman, and Laurell in their individual capacities for (i) denial of equal protection by subjecting Plaintiff to gender discrimination; (ii) First Amendment retaliation; and (iii) denial of due process und er the Fourteenth Amendment. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff copies of the Complaint (Filing No. 1 and 1-1) and this Memorandum and Order, along with eight summons forms and eight USM 285 Forms for service on the followin g defendants: the Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services; Philips in her official capacity; and Philips, Black, Malone, Becker, Dykeman, and Laurell in theirindividual capacities. (See attached Notice Regarding Service.) Federal Rule of C ivil Procedure 4(m) requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However, Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own motion, an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. (See this courts General Order No. 2015-06.) If requested to do so in this matter, the United States Marshal will serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. In making such a request, Plaintiff must complete the USM 285 forms to be submitted to the clerk of the court with the completed summons forms. Without these documents, the United States Marshal will not serve process. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the clerk of the court will sign the summons forms and forward them to the United States Marshal for service on the defendants, together with a copy of the Complaint. In the event Plaintiff asks the United States Marshal to serve process, the clerk of the court will make copies of the Complaint for service on the defendants. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: March 10, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff's Request for Summons 3 is denied without prejudice to reassertion at a later time. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MLF, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Dykeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Laurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?