Creative Retail Packaging, Inc. v. Kids Against Hunger et al
Plaintiff: Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.
Defendant: Freedom Foods and Kids Against Hunger
Case Number: 8:2016cv00411
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 BANKRUPTCY REFERRAL ORDER - This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall close this case for statistical purposes. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver, or send electronically, the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on 58 Motion to Extend -1) Plaintiff's motion (filing no. 58 ) is granted.2) Counsel shall contact chambers by November 30, 2017 to advise the undersigned of the status of the parties' settlement efforts and whether a scheduling conference with the undersigned is desired. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TLSS)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: A planning conference is set for May 24, 2017 at 9:30 am. Parties shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The Clerk's Office shall mail this order to Defaulted Defendant, Kids Against Hunger, at c/o Darrel D. Malcom, P.O. Box 88536, Carol Stream, IL 60188-8536. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(TCL)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion (filing 41 ) to amend is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike filing 40 as duplicative. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that on or before May 1, 2017, Kids Against Hunger shall obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf, absent which the Court may enter a judgment of default against it without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Kids Against Hunger, c/o Darrel D. Malcom, Secretary/Treasurer, P.O. Box 88536, Carol Stream, IL 60188-8536. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Retail Packaging, Inc. v. Kids Against Hunger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Doyle
Represented By: Gregory S. Frayser
Represented By: Kevin J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Foods
Represented By: Andrew M. Hollingsead
Represented By: Michael J. Matukewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids Against Hunger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?