Bradley v. United States Supreme Court, Justice et al
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Defendant: County Attorneys in Nebraska, Judges in the State of Nebraska, United States Supreme Court, Justice and Wardens, Corrections Directors
Case Number: 8:2016cv00418
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to set aside the court's order (Filing No. 15 ) is denied. Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment will be entered by separate document. If Plaintiff seeks to appe al this dismissal, the notice of appeal must be accompanied by an appellate filing fee in the amount of $505.00. Plaintiff will not be permitted to appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's memorandum and order entered on September 27, 2016 (Filing No. 7 ) is set aside and vacated. The clerk of the court shall notify Plaintiff's institution to stop collecting partial filing fee payments and shall remit any funds already collected pursuant to the vacated order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Plaintiff's "motions to have the case heard" (Filing Nos . 9 and 12 ), treated as supplemental motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, are denied. Plaintiff has until January 17, 2017, to either show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the fu ll $400.00 filing fee. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 17, 2017: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution; copy e-mailed to finance.) (GJG)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without furt her notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 7, 2016: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Juan Bradley shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $$2.94 by 10/28/2016, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After pa yment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's offi ce is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 28, 2016: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. United States Supreme Court, Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Attorneys in Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judges in the State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Supreme Court, Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens, Corrections Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?