Harris v. Gage
Petitioner: Michael E. Harris
Respondent: Brian Gage
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2016cv00442
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's "Second Motion for Leave to Amend" (Filing No. 18 ) is denied. Petitioner shall file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that clearly presents all of his claims for relief by May 9, 2017. Petitioner is warned that the amended petition will supersede, not supplement, his initial habeas petition. This means that failure to include any claims in the amended petition from his initial habeas petition will be deemed abandoned. Failure to file an amended petition within the time set by the court will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Petitioner. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's "Motion for Leave to Amend" (Filing No. 16 ) is granted. Petitioner shall file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that clearly presents all of his claims for relief by May 9, 2017. Petiti oner is warned that the amended petition will supersede, not supplement, his initial habeas petition. Failure to file an amended petition within the time set by the court will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Petitioner. F ollowing the filing of the amended petition, the court will enter a new order progressing this matter to disposition. Petitioner's "Motion for Appointment of Counsel" (Filing No. 15 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The clerk's office is directed to set the following case management deadline: May 9, 2017: check for Amended Petition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's objection (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ) and supplemental petition (Filing No. 5 ), the court preliminarily determines that Claims One, Two, Four, Five, Six, and Eight, as they are set forth in this M emorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. Claims Three and Seven are not cognizable and they are dismissed. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respo ndent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By March 26, 2017, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case managem ent deadline in this case using the following text: March 26, 2017: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline i n this case using the following text: April 25, 2017: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (KLF)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?