Sanders v. Transit Authority of the City of Omaha d/b/a Metro
Plaintiff: James R. Sanders
Defendant: Transit Authority of the City of Omaha
Case Number: 8:2016cv00454
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the defendant's motion for attorneys' fees (filing 45 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the accompanying Memorandum and Order 43 , judgment is entered for the defendant and against the plaintiff, and the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the defendant's motion to continue trial, (Filing No. 31 ), is granted. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2018 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 11:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Motions to Withdraw as Attorney 28 and 29 . Ryan Kunhart and Jeffrey Blumel are granted leave to withdraw as Attorneys for Defendant Transit Authority of the City of Omaha. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Transit Authority of the City of Omaha d/b/a Metro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Sanders
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit Authority of the City of Omaha
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Blumel
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?