Westhoff v. DB Industries, LLC
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Westhoff
Defendant: DB Industries, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00456
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - The relief requested in the Unopposed Stipulation for Dismissal, ECF No. 39 , is granted. The above-captioned case is dismissed, with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The Stipulated Motion to Amend the Order Setting Schedule of Progression of Case (Filing No. 37 ) is granted, and the earlier progression orders are amended as follows: Depositions due 5 /31/2018. 10-day Jury Trial set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of 8/20/2019, in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - The parties' Stipulated Protective Order (Filing No. 33 ) is adopted as set forth in Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the Motion for Leave to Intervene (Filing No. 24 ) filed by the City of Omaha is granted. The City of Omaha shall file its Complaint in Intervention on or before October 19, 2017. The Clerk of Court shall add The City of Omaha to the case caption as Intervenor-Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the plaintiff shall file the parties' joint, written report in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on December 8, 2016, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon the plaintiff and/or his counsel in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(ii)-(vii). Possible sanctions include dismissal of the action without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westhoff v. DB Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jens Erik Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas J. Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?