Goodwin v. Dunning
Plaintiff: Violet Goodwin
Defendant: Timothy Dunning
Case Number: 8:2016cv00458
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the pro se plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Filing No. 50 . The court has reviewed the motion and her poverty affidavit. The court will grant her request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, Filing No. 50 , is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The findings and recommendation of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 41 , is adopted and affirmed in its entirety. The motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 44 , is denied as moot. Plaintiff's objection, Filing No. 42 , is denied. This case is dismissed with prejudice. A judgment will be entered this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's objection to the magistrate judges order, Filing No. 33 , is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis, Filing No. 34 , is denied. The magistrate judge's order, Filing No. 31 , is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Stay or Extension of Deadlines (Filing No. 30 ) is granted. All case progression deadlines in this matter are stayed pending a ruling on Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. (Filing No. 26 ) The pre trial conference is hereby continued. New progression deadlines and the date of the pretrial conference will be set following the ruling on Defendant's Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - that Defendant's Motion to Strike Amended Complaint (Filing No. 28 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 27 ). The Clerk is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Deadlines. (Filing No. 24 .) The motion is granted. The Final Pretrial Conference will be held before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on January 9, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. The trial date will be set by the undersigned Magistrate Judge at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: Final Pretrial Conference before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis to be held on January 9, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING LETTER AND PROGRESSION ORDER - Pursuant to Defendant's request for clarification of the scheduling letter entered in this case (Filing No. 19 ), the scheduling letter (Filing No. 16 ) previously entered in this case is h ereby vacated. The following provisions shall govern progression of this case: IT IS ORDERED: All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by May 30, 2017. All interrogatories, requests for admission an d requests for production or inspection, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be served on or before March 23, 2017. The Final Pretrial Conference will be held before the Magistrate Judge on November 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Pr ior to the pretrial conference, all items as directed in NECivR and full preparation shall have been completed so that trial may begin at any time following the Pretrial Conference. The trial date will be set by the Magistrate Judge at the time o f the Final Pretrial Conference. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Susan Bazis to be held on November 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's procedural due process claim against Defendant, in his official capacity only, may proceed to service of process. Upon being served, Defendant will be required to respond only to that claim. To obtain ser vice of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the Clerk of the Court will provide. The Clerk of the Court shall send ONE (1) Summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this M emorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the Court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the Court will sign the Summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of the Complaint and the Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint without payment of cos ts or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the Marshal. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint and Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff does not need to do so . The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "March 2, 2017: Check for completion of service of summons." The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Proce dure and by the Local Rules of this court. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with documents as directed )(GJG)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?