Franklin v. Frakes et al

Plaintiff: Joshua G. Franklin, Sr.
Defendant: Fred Britten, Bruns, Busboom, Campbell, Scott Frakes, Brad Hansen, Hargreaves, Haussler, Heckman, Holly, John Does 1-10, Barbara Liewen, McClymont, Oltrogge, Mario Peart, Diane Sabatka-Rine, Schrotberger, Sherman, Kara Simpson, Sparks, Sulley, Tan, Taylor, Jonathan Watt, Weiner and Weiss
Case Number: 8:2016cv00470
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that John Does 1-10 and the OCC "second shift supervisor" during July of 2015 are dismissed from this case without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to comply with the court's order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 11, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the following claims may proceed to service of process. Plaintiff must identify John Does 1-10 and the OCC "second shift supervisor" during July of 2015 before his claims against them can proceed to service of proc ess. Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to take reasonable steps to identify John Does 1-10 and the OCC "second shift supervisor" during July of 2015 and notify the court of their names, after which the c ourt will initiate service of process. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the following claims without prejudice and without further notice. The following claims may proceed to service of process against these Defendants once identified. Pl aintiff's remaining federal claims against Defendants are dismissed for the reasons set forth in this Memorandum and Order, with the caveat that any individual defendant will be reinstated if later identified as one of the John Does. Plaintiff& #039;s request for a temporary injunction is denied. Plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The clerk of the court is directed to add Charles Rine, Assistant Warden and to reinstate McClyme nt, Case Manager (previously McClymont, Lieutenant) as defendants in this matter. For service of process on Defendants Fred Britten and Charles Rine in their official capacities, the clerk of the court is directed to complete 2 summons forms and 2 US M-285 forms for Defendants Fred Britten and Charles Rine using the address "Office of the Nebraska Attorney General, 2115 State Capitol, Lincoln, NE 68509," and forward them together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 19) and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendants Fred Britten and Charles Rine in their official capacities at the Office of the Nebraska Attorney General,2115 State Capitol, Lincoln, NE 68509. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(j)(2); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-510.02 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendant Fred Britten in his individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 for m for Defendant Fred Britten using the address "Diagnostic and Evaluation Center, 3220 West Van Dorn Street, Lincoln, NE 68522" and forward them together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 19 ) and a copy of this Memorandum a nd Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendant Fred Britten personally in his individual capacity at the Diagnostic and Evaluation Center, 3220 West Van Dorn Street, Lincoln, NE 68522. Service may also be accomplished by using any of the following methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). For service of process on Defendants "Case Manager McClyme nt" and "Unit Administrator Weiss" in their individual capacities, the clerk of the court is directed to complete 2 summons forms and 2 USM-285 forms for Defendants "Case Manager McClyment" and "Unit Administrator Weiss" using the address "Omaha Correctional Center, 2323 Avenue J Street, Omaha, NE 68110" and forward them together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 19 ) and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve Defendants "Case Manager McClyment" and "Unit Administrator Weiss" personally in their individual capacities at the Omaha Correctional Center, 2323 Avenue J Street, Omaha, NE 68110. Service may also b e accomplished by using any of the following methods: residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). The clerk of the court is directed to obtain t he last-known addresses for Defendants Charles Rine, Dennis Bakewell, and Diane Sabatka-Rine from the United States Marshals Service for service of process on Defendants Charles Rine, Dennis Bakewell, and Diane Sabatka-Rine in their individual capaci ties. Once such addresses are obtained, the clerk of the court is directed to complete 3 summons forms and 3 USM-285 forms for Defendants Charles Rine, Dennis Bakewell, and Diane Sabatka-Rine using the addresses provided by the Marshals Service and f orward them together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 19 ) and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service for service of process on Defendants Charles Rine, Dennis Bakewell, and Diane Sabatka-Rine in their individual capacities. Service may be accomplished by using any of the following methods: personal, residence, certified mail, or designated delivery service. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e); Neb. Rev. Stat. § 25-508.01 (Reissue 2016). The United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to file under seal any documents containing the last-known personal addresses for Defendants Charles Rine, Dennis Bakew ell, and Diane Sabatka-Rine. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: June 12, 2017: check if Plaintiff identified individuals in paragraph 2. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: August 9, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
April 10, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 18 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
March 22, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk's office shall reopen this matter. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint no later than April 5, 2017. Should Plaintiff fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without further notice. The cle rk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: April 5, 2017: check for amended complaint. The Order and Judgment dated March 20, 2017, dismissing this matter without prejudice are vacated. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
March 20, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's order to file an amended complaint that complied with Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
January 30, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than March 1, 2017. Should Plaintiff fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of court is directed to set a case management deadline using the following text: March 1, 2017: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
October 28, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $13.00 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in resp onse to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the follow ing text: November 28, 2016: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plai ntiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 4 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Britten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hargreaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Liewen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClymont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oltrogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Peart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schrotberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua G. Franklin, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?