Bradley v. Quist et al
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Defendant: Rein Quist and United States Supreme Court
Case Number: 8:2016cv00478
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to have the case heard (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment will be entered by separate document. If Plaintiff seeks to appeal this dismissal, the notice of appeal must be accompanied by an appellate filing fee in the amount of $505.00. Plaintiff will not be permitted to appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's memorandum and order entered on November 22, 2016 (Filing No. 7 ) is set aside and vacated. The clerk of the court shall notify Plaintiff's institution to stop collecting partial filing fee payments and shall remit any funds already collected pursuant to the vacated order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 )is denied. Plaintiff's supplemental motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing N o. 8 ) is denied. Plaintiff has until January 12, 2016, to either show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the full $350.00 filing fee. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matte r will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 12, 2016: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to plaintiff's institution; copy e-mailed to finance)(GJG)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Juan Bradley shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.01 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After paymen t of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution mustcollect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. Pro Se The clerk's office is di rected to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 22, 2016: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(copy to institution as directed) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Quist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rein Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?