Norfolk Transmission & Muffler Service, Inc. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Norfolk Transmission & Muffler Service, Inc.
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00489
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Motion to Extend Deadline and To Continue Trial 82 is granted. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for September 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in ch ambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A 4-day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of October 9, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. A settlement conference with the Court has been scheduled for September 14, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom #7, located on the 2nd Floor of the Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse. A separate order will be issued regarding the settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for May 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courth ouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A 5-day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of June 11, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - that Defendant's Amended Motion to Extend Deadlines (Filing No. 35 ) is granted. The parties have advised the Court that they plan to mediate this dispute. No later than August 29, 2017, the parties shall file a joint report with the Court advising as to when the mediation will occur. If mediation is unsuccessful, the Court will schedule another planning conference to set additional case progression deadlines and set this matter for trial. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: "August 29, 2017: Status Report Due." Defendant's Motion to Extend Written Discovery Deadline and Expert Disclosure Deadline (Filing No. 33 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The parties have advised the Court that they plan to mediate this dispute. No later than August 29, 2017, the parties shall file a joint report with the Court advising as to when the mediation will occ ur. If mediation is unsuccessful, the Court will schedule another planning conference to set additional case progression deadlines and set this matter for trial. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: "August 29, 2017: Status Report Due." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Transmission & Muffler Service, Inc. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Transmission & Muffler Service, Inc.
Represented By: Larry E. Bache, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?