Sepulveda-Rodriguez v. MetLife Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Silvia Sepulveda-Rodriguez
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, MetLife Group, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00507
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendant Ford Motor Company is granted. Defendant Ford Motor Company is dismissed, with prejudice. A Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit (Eighth Circuit), Filing No. 101 . The action was remanded for further consideration of the attorney fee award fee award in light of the results the plaintiff obtained against Ford and for consideration of whether it is appropriate to award the equitable remedy of a return of the life insurance premiums paid by plaintiffs decedent during his employment with Ford. The Court finds briefing on those issues is appropriate. Accordingly, The parties shall file briefs on the above issues within one week of the date of this order The parties shall file responsive briefs within one week thereafter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the plaintiff's motion to withdraw her Bill of Costs. Filing No. 97 . The court has reviewed the matter and finds the motion should be granted. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to withdraw her Bill of Cost is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - ACCORDINGLY, IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62, that any execution upon or other proceedings to enforce the judgment issued in this action is hereby stayed, pending final disposition of the appeals filed on behalf of Defendants. The requirement for a supersedeas bond or other security is waived. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees (Filing No. 75 ) is granted. Plaintiff is awarded fees in the amount of $27,045 and costs in the amount of $420. A Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will issue this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motions for summary judgment filed by Defendants Metropolitan and Ford (Filing Nos. 56 and 58 ) are denied. The motion for summary judgment filed by plaintiff (Filing No. 65 ) is granted. MetLife Group, Inc. is d ismissed as a party defendant. Plaintiff shall file a motion for attorney fees within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. After the attorney fee issue is resolved, judgment will be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against defendant Ford in the amount of $2,090.00 on the plaintiff's failure to provide plan documents claim; Judgment will be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against defendant Metropolitan in the amount of $92,694.00 on the plaintiff's claim for denial of benefits; Judgment will be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against defendants Metropolitan and Ford on the plaintiff's equitable claims. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that the parties shall have until July 14, 2017, to file the administrative record and applicable plan documents. The defendant shall have until September 15, 2017, to file a motion and brief to affirm the administrator's decision. The plaintiff shall have until October 6, 2017, to respond to the defendant's motion. The defendant shall have until October 20, 2017, to file a reply. Should the court require any further proceedings in the matter, the parties will be notified by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amended Complaint (Filing No. 27 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint on or before March 8, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sepulveda-Rodriguez v. MetLife Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Sepulveda-Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas J. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?