Fisher v. GLS Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kip Fisher
Defendant: GLS Companies, Inc., Doug Hammerseng and Nancy Kunkel
Case Number: 8:2016cv00516
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice 28 is approved. The action is dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MBM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Doug Hammerseng and Nancy Kunkel with Prejudice, ECF No. 25 , is granted. All claims are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Doug Hammerseng and Nancy Kunkel. The Court will not assess costs or attorneys fees as to Defendants Doug Hammerseng and Nancy Kunkel. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Joint Stipulation to Indefinitely Suspend Litigation (Filing No. 16 ) is approved. The deadlines in the above-captioned case shall remain stayed during the pendency of the parties' settlement discussions. Any party may decla re the settlement discussions have reached an impasse by informing the other parties, in writing, of such impasse, at which time Defendants will have 10-business days (commencing the day after notice of impasse is received), to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In the event a settlement or impasse in settlement discussions are not reached within 90-days, counsel for the parties shall file a joint status report on May 16, 2017, concerning the status of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. GLS Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Fisher
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLS Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Hammerseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?