Vasquez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Sean B. Vasquez
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00521
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2018 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 115 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and complete record waived. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
June 7, 2018 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The parties' motions in limine (Filing Nos. 92 , 94 , and 106 ) are granted and denied as set forth in this order. Plaintiff's motion to strike the Railroad's third supplemental expert witness disclosures (Filing No. 103 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 9, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Expert Witness Karen Stricklett (Filing No. 53 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Evidence of Psychological Evaluation Performed by Rosanna M. Jones-T hurman (Filing No. 65 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds that Defendant's late disclosure of Karen Stricklett's report was substantially justified and harmless. The Court further finds that Defendant has shown good ca use for the timing of the disclosure. As to Rosanna M. Jones-Thurman, she has not been designated as an expert witness in this case and will not be testifying in this case. Her information was used by Dr. Davis in conducting his Rule 35 examination of Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 13, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - After due consideration, the request for protective order (Filing No. 54 ) is granted. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff, Sean Vasquez, as well as his agents and representatives, shall adhere to and are hereby commanded to comply with all of the provisions of this Protective Order relating to production of the VRC Billing Guidelines; and specifically, they are commanded to comply with all of the Terms and Conditions, see order for terms and conditions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: David J. Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean B. Vasquez
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?