Heisler v. Flowerama et al
Plaintiff: Deena Heisler
Defendant: Flowerama, John Doe 1 and 2 Inclusive and Trek Properties, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00527
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT regarding Order on Findings and Recommendation 11 . Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff shall have until May 5, 2017 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Plaintiff's application, (Filing No. 2 ) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with two summons form(s) and two USM-285 form( s) to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is not requesting service by United States Marshal, Plaintiff's attorney of record shall, as soon as possible, complete the summons form(s) and r eturn them to the Clerk of the court to be issued. The issued summon(s) will then be returned to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is requesting service by the United States Marshal, Plaintiff's a ttorney of record shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 form(s) and the summons form(s) and return them to the Clerk of the court. The Clerk of the court will sign the summons form(s), to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Com plaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint; Plaintiff's counsel need not do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. This order is enter ed without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heisler v. Flowerama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowerama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 and 2 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trek Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Heisler
Represented By: David J. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?