Crabar/GBF, Inc. v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Crabar/GBF, Inc.
Defendant: Mark Wright and Wright Printing Co.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00537
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER (AMENDED) - that the Stipulation to Enter Amended Progression Schedule (Filing No. 254 ) is granted, and the final progression order is as follows: The trial scheduled for October 21, 2019, is cancelled and will be res cheduled at a later date. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled before the undersigned magistrate judge on March 1, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted in chambers. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to nelson@ned.uscourts.gov, in Word format, by 3:00 p.m. on February 22, 2021. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magi strate judge on September 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline for fact witnesses is June 5, 2020. The deposition deadline for expert witnesses is October 2, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Crabar's motion to set aside (filing 242 ) is granted. Fredrickson's and Kohlhaas' motion to dismiss (filing 226 ) is denied. The defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 228 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Filing No. 154 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file its proposed Second Amended Complaint on or before December 31, 2018. Defendants may file their responsive pleading(s) with in sixty (60) days after the Second Amended Complaint is filed. Defendants Motion to Strike Declarations of Elissa Isaacs and David Crysler (Filing No. 172 ) is denied. Plaintiff's first Motion to Compel (Filing No. 191 ) is denied, without pr ejudice. Plaintiffs second Motion to Compel (Filing No. 195 ) is denied, without prejudice. The current case progression deadlines are suspended pending the parties submission of a joint proposed amended case progression schedule within fourteen (14) days of the filing of all responses to the amended complaint and resolution of any motions to dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Crabar's motion for partial summary judgment (filing 56 ) as to § 5.1 (c) is denied. Wright and Wright Printing's motion for partial summary judgment (filing 75 ) as to §§ 5.1 (c) and (e) is granted. Crabar's motion to dismiss (filing 65 ) Wright Printing's counterclaim is granted. Wright and Wright Printing's counterclaim is dismissed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE that the Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines in Final Progression Order (Filing No. 113 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.(LAC)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and Confidentiality Agreement granting 31 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SMN)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that this matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might rea sonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse herself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabar/GBF, Inc. v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crabar/GBF, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Elissa L. Isaacs
Represented By: Sarah L. McGill
Represented By: Stephen O'Donnell
Represented By: Paul M. Shotkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wright
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Printing Co.
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?