Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Dunlap et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Luella P. Dunlap, Melissa K. Easton, Kuncl Funeral Home, Inc. and John D. Prokop
Case Number: 8:2016cv00540
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Court hereby orders disbursement jointly to Melissa Easton and John Prokop in the amount of $72,380.66 plus any accrued interest. Upon receipt of a completed Internal Revenue Service Form W-9 from Melissa Easton and John Prokop, the Clerk shall mail the funds to Defendants' counsel, Lyle Joseph Koenig. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant) (Copy emailed to Financial Administrator)(ADB)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before July 27, 2017, attorney Lyle J. Koenig, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the Court removing Lyle J. Koenig as counsel of record for the Defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER that the Plaintiff may deposit a check in the amount of $72,380.66 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2041 and NECivR 67.1. Plaintiff is discharged from any further liability to Defendants upon payment of interpleaded funds totaling $72,380.66. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (E-mailed Copy to Finance)(LAC)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds and for Discharge (Filing No. 17 ) is granted. Plaintiff may deposit a check in the amount of $70,000.00 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2041 and NECivR 67.1. Plaintiff is discharged from any further liability to Defendants upon payment of interpleaded funds totaling $70,000.00. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (E-mailed Copy to Finance)(LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Dunlap et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luella P. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa K. Easton
Represented By: Lyle J. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuncl Funeral Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Prokop
Represented By: Lyle J. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?