Ellis v. Hansen
Petitioner: Roy L. Ellis
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2016cv00549
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (filing no. 27 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (filing no. 8 ) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate filing no. 24 , a notice of submission by Respondent, because the notice is not a motion. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Petitioner's motion for enlargement of time (filing no. 21 ) is granted. Petitioner shall have until the close of business on July 26, 2017, to file his responsive brief. Respondent shall have until the close of business on August 28, 2017, to file his reply brief. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Petitioner. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - that the defendant's "answer and objection to respondent for enlargement of time and request for default judgment" (filing no. 13 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the respondent's motion for enlargement (filing no. 11 ) is granted. The respondent shall file his motion for summary judgment or state court records on or before May 25, 2017. The petitioner shall file his responsive brief on or before June 26, 2017. And the respondent shall file his reply brief on or before July 26, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Amended Petition (Filing No. 8 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. By April 14, 2017, Respondent must file a motion for su mmary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 14, 2017: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in s upport of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 15, 2017: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that the petition is insufficient and it is therefore denied without prejudice. Taking the prison mailbox rule into account, on or before February 6, 2017, Petitioner shall file an amended petition using AO Form 241. Following the instruction provided above, Petitioner shall state his claim(s) and supporting fact(s) concisely and without argument or legal citation. That can normally be done using the form itself without attachments. The Clerk shall mail a copy of the official habeas form to the Petitioner at the address he has given in this case. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing No. 4 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?