Phillips v. Frakes et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod Phillips
Defendant: John Chavez, Scott Frakes, James Rocke, Mike Rothwell and Diane Sabatka-Rine
Case Number: 8:2016cv00554
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's request for a new case number is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing plaintiff's action without prejudice. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(CCB)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that on the court's own motion, the court will give Plaintiff 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint using a standard form Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner). Plaintiff's failure to file an Amend ed Complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is direct to provide Plaintiff a copy of a standard form Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner) when m ailing him a copy of this Memorandum and Order. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: April 6, 2017: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing Nos. 5 and 9 ) isgranted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.50 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a writ ten motion. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 23, 2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/23/2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (CS)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter wi thout further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 19, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Rothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?