Starkey v. Amber Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lana L. Starkey
Defendant: Mike Agostino, Amber Enterprises, Inc. and Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00029
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines. (Filing No. 54 .) This motion is granted. All depositions, whether or not they ar e intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by May 31, 2019. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for December 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United Sta tes Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A five (5) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of January 13, 2020, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by February 15, 2019. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for July 23, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A five (5) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of August 12, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - regarding telephone conference regarding a discovery dispute was held before the undersigned on September 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting Joint Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines 37 . All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by October 15, 2018. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for March 15, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A five (5) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of April 8, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Stipulation and Motion for Protective Order. (Filing No. 28 .) The motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starkey v. Amber Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Agostino
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana L. Starkey
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Represented By: Jamie M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?