Cook v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosemary Cook
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00034
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that as to the issue of damages, the discovery and case progression deadlines are set aside pending further order of the court. As to the issue of liability, the discovery and case progression deadlines remain, and discovery as to that liabi lity is complete. Defendant's anticipated motion for summary judgment on the issue of liability shall be filed on or before November 15, 2017. If this case is not resolved on Defendant's anticipated summary judgment motion, within 10 days following the court's ruling, counsel shall contract my chambers to set a telephone conference for entering a case scheduling order on the issue of damages. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Christopher D. Sandy as counsel on behalf of Defendant, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., (Filing No. 19 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Nicholas K. Rudman as counsel on behalf of Defendant, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., (Filing No. 17 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Cook
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Represented By: BAIRD, HOLM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Christopher D. Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?