West v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer West
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2017cv00036
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Chiodo (Filing No. 74 ) is granted. The motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 75 ) is granted. The motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Perez (Filing No. 73 ) is denied as moot. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Filing No. 63 is stricken. The deadlines for filing motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, and motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds remain set for November 22, 2019. The settlement conference previously scheduled to be held on November 8, 2019 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the progression order is amended as follows: The deadlines for filing motions for summary judgment are: As to the statute of limitations: October 25, 2019. As to all other issues: January 15, 2020. The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is January 15, 2020. The settlement conference previously scheduled to be held on November 8, 2019 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties' Consent to Magistrate Judge, Filing No. 55 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the Honorable Cheryl R. Zwart, United States Magistrate Judge, for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 and the foregoing consent of the parties. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that the Court adopts the parties' joint proposals, numbers 1 through 5 as set forth above. As to any wrongful death case filed after this date, Plaintiff shall attach a copy of the letter of personal representation to the Complaint. For all cases already filed, if letters of personal representation have not already been produced, the letters shall be produced to defendants by May 16, 2019. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 6/24/2019 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion 32 for Order Directing Disclosure of Protected Health Information. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (CS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer West
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?