Johnson v. Frakes
Petitioner: |
James D. Johnson |
Respondent: |
Scott R. Frakes |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2017cv00039 |
Filed: |
February 9, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 31, 2017 |
Filing
67
ORDER - that Ronnie E. Simmon's Motion to Join Action or Intervene Thereon With/As Party Plaintiffs (filing no. 64 ) and Motion for Class Action Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (filing no. 65 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (KLF)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing
63
ORDER - Daryl D. Eskridge's motion to intervene (filing no. 55 ), motion to certify class and to appoint counsel (filing no. 56 ), and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (filing no. 57 ) are denied. Scotty R. Glassco's motion to intervene (filing no. 59 ), motion to certify class and to appoint counsel (filing no. 60 ), and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (filing no. 61 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed to pro se parties) (KLF)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing
54
ORDER - that the motions of non-parties (filing nos. 39 - 41 , filing nos. 43 - 45 , filings 47 - 49 and filings 51 - 53 ) are denied, for among other reasons, because they are frivolous. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER - that the following motions submitted by a non-party (Ryan G. Long) are denied, to wit: Motion to Intervene (filing no. 31 ), Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 32 ), and Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 33 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER - The Petitioner James D. Johnson, but only the Petitioner James D.Johnson, is given leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Request That Circuit Judge or Judges Issue the Requisite Certificate of Appealability filed by James D. Johnson (Filing No. 24 ) is referred to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals for consideration. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of filing no. 24 to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals, and term the motion. The motion to intervene (filing no. 20 ), the motion for class action certification and to appoint counsel (filing no. 21 ), and the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (filing No. 22 ) submitted by William James Bland are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (KLF)
|
March 24, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER - that the motions to intervene (filing nos. 11 and 15 ), motions to appoint counsel (filing nos. 12 and 16 ), and motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (filing nos. 13 and 17 ) are denied. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. English and Mr. Dubray. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (KLF)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
8
CORRECTED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Correcting Case caption only) - IT IS ORDERED that: The application to proceed in forma pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is granted. The motion for Class Action Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (filing no. [4 ]) is denied as moot. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice for lack of a federal claim. No certificate of appealabilility will be granted. A judgment will be entered by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?