Harper v. State of Nebraska
Plaintiff: Clyde Ernest Harper
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2017cv00058
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's memorandum and order entered April 4, 2017 (Filing No. 9 ), is set aside and vacated. The clerk of the court shall notify Plaintiff's institution to stop collecting partial filing fee payments and shall r emit any funds already collected pursuant to the vacated order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 6 ) is denied. Plaintiff has until June 15, 2017, to either show cause why this case should not be dismissed p ursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the full $400.00 filing fee. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: June 15, 2017: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's Institution; Emailed to Finance) (KLF)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 6 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.13 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 4, 2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 29, 2017: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form as directed )(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Ernest Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?